PA HB391 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on November 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in forgery and fraudulent practices, defining the offense of false caller identification information display; and imposing penalties.
Title
In forgery and fraudulent practices, defining the offense of false caller identification information display; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Floor: HB 391 PN 428, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Floor: HB 391 PN 428, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-11-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-11-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-19 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-17 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |