PA HB391 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-19 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of April 25, 1933 (P.L.74, No.49), entitled "An act relating to baseball and football on Sunday; prohibiting baseball and football on Sunday during certain hours, and also during certain other hours unless the electors of a municipality are in favor of the same and, in certain cases, a license has first been secured from the municipal authorities; providing for referendums to ascertain the will of the electors, and for the enactment and repeal of licensing ordinances and resolutions in accordance therewith; providing penalties; and repealing inconsistent laws."
Title
Repealing the act of April 25, 1933 (P.L.74, No.49), entitled "An act relating to baseball and football on Sunday; prohibiting baseball and football on Sunday during certain hours, and also during certain other hours unless the electors of a municipality are in favor of the same and, in certain cases, a license has first been secured from the municipal authorities; providing for referendums to ascertain the will of the electors, and for the enactment and repeal of licensing ordinances and resolutions in accordance therewith; providing penalties; and repealing inconsistent laws."
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Dowling [R] | Rep. Karen Boback [R] | Rep. George Dunbar [R] | Rep. Jesse Topper [R] |
Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Rep. Brian Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 391 PN 366, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 391 PN 366, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-09-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-2) |
2022-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-14 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-07-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |