PA HB66 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority and for transfer of existing facilities to authority and providing for sale or transfer of authority water or sewer infrastructure.
Title
In municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority and for transfer of existing facilities to authority and providing for sale or transfer of authority water or sewer infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Godshall [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] | Rep. Mark Cohen [D] |
Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 66 PN 845, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Floor: HB 66 PN 57, 2015 A297, DAVIS (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 66 PN 845, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Floor: HB 66 PN 57, 2015 A297, DAVIS (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-03-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2015-03-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-03-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-03-04 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-03-02 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-25 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |