PA HB69 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 65
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 65
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, defining "mounted specimen"; and further providing for buying and selling game and for safety zones.
Title
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, defining "mounted specimen"; and further providing for buying and selling game and for safety zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-09 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-07-04 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-07-04 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-07-04 | Signed in House | |
2008-07-04 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2008-07-04 | Reported as committed | |
2008-07-03 | Referred to RULES | |
2008-07-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-07-02 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-24 | First consideration | |
2008-06-24 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-19 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES | |
2007-06-18 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-13 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-21 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-21 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-09 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-09 | First consideration | |
2007-05-09 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=69 |