PA HB774 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, in special powers and duties of counties, further providing for board of visitors for charitable reform and penal institutions.
Title
In special powers and duties of counties, further providing for board of visitors for charitable reform and penal institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Brennan [D] | Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] | Rep. Florindo Fabrizio [D] |
Rep. Michael Hanna [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - House - HB 774 PN 1846, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-01-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-01-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2012-01-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-01-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-01-24 | House | Second consideration |
2012-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-10 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |