PA HB81 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-6)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-25 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-25 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for vehicles exempt from registration and for persons exempt from licensing.
Title
Further providing for vehicles exempt from registration and for persons exempt from licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-22 - House - HB 81 PN 59, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2013-01-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-01-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-01-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-01-16 | House | Second consideration |
2013-01-15 | House | Removed from table |
2013-01-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-01-15 | House | First consideration |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |