PA HB829 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions;
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions;
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 829 PN 3417, 2023 A5284, SANTARSIERO Amendment No. A-5284 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A05254 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 829 PN 1039, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00207 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 829 PN 3417, 2023 A5284, SANTARSIERO Amendment No. A-5284 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A05254 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 829 PN 1039, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00207 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (47-2) |
2024-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2023-05-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-2) |
2023-05-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-02 | House | Second consideration |
2023-05-01 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |