PA HR203 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution recognizing June 19, 2022, as "Korean-American Citizenship Day" in Pennsylvania to celebrate the first naturalization of a Korean-American citizen in 1890.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution recognizing June 19, 2022, as "Korean-American Citizenship Day" in Pennsylvania to celebrate the first naturalization of a Korean-American citizen in 1890.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 203 PN 3107 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HR 203 PN 3107 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HR 203 PN 3107 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Adopted (50-0) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2022-06-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-08 | House | Adopted (198-0) |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |