PA HR57 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on December 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-17 - Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on December 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-17 - Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution supporting youth tobacco prevention initiatives.
Title
Supporting youth tobacco prevention initiatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-17 - House - HR 57 PN 1919 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-17 | House | Adopted (199-0) |
2013-10-22 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to HEALTH |