PA SB1138 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Act No. 35 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Act No. 35 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for the State Geospatial Coordinating Board.
Title
In organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for the State Geospatial Coordinating Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1138 PN 1725, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1138 PN 1725, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1138 PN 1725, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | House | Act No. 35 of 2024 |
2024-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2024-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2024-06-28 | House | Signed in House |
2024-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2024-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2024-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-27 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2024-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2024-06-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2024-06-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2024-06-13 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2024-06-12 | House | In the House |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |