PA SB1177 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in administration of act, further providing for State Unemployment Compensation Advisory Counsel.
Title
In administration of act, further providing for State Unemployment Compensation Advisory Counsel.
Sponsors
Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1177 PN 1550, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2024-07-02 | House | In the House |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-22) |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |