PA SB155 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 28, 1984 (P.L.150, No.28), known as the Automobile Lemon Law, further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2023-01-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |