PA SB636 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 21, 1943 (P.L.571, No.254), known as The Fourth to Eighth Class County Assessment Law, eliminating office of assessor in boroughs and townships of the first class; making conforming amendments; and making repeals.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 21, 1943 (P.L.571, No.254), known as The Fourth to Eighth Class County Assessment Law, eliminating office of assessor in boroughs and townships of the first class; making conforming amendments; and making repeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Earll [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Robert Wonderling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-13 | Removed from table | |
2007-12-12 | Laid on the table | |
2007-12-12 | First consideration | |
2007-12-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-04 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2007-05-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-04-30 | Amended on third consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-18 | First consideration | |
2007-04-18 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=636 |