RI H5679 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Statutes And Statutory Construction (act Is The Annual Statutory Construction Bill, Prepared Based Upon Recommendations Of The Law Revision Office/this Act Would Make Technical Changes And Revisions To Various General Laws)
Title
An Act Relating To Statutes And Statutory Construction (act Is The Annual Statutory Construction Bill, Prepared Based Upon Recommendations Of The Law Revision Office/this Act Would Make Technical Changes And Revisions To Various General Laws)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-06-06 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-05-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2013) |
2013-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2013) |
2013-05-23 | House | House voted to recommit to House Judiciary |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2013) |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2013) |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5679.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5679A.pdf |