RI H5981 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/31/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/31/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of automated traffic-speed camera-enforcement systems on all state and local roads within the state, not just in school zones
Title
Automated Traffic Speed Enforcement System
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/31/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5981.pdf |