RI H6126 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Gambling And Lotteries (would Permit A Senior Citizens Center To Obtain A Permit Approved By The Division Of State Police To Conduct Bingo In The Senior Citizens Center)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Gambling And Lotteries (would Permit A Senior Citizens Center To Obtain A Permit Approved By The Division Of State Police To Conduct Bingo In The Senior Citizens Center)
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Baldelli-Hunt [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-06-21 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013) |
2013-06-13 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-06-12 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2013) |
2013-05-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2013) |
2013-05-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6126.pdf |