RI H7059 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- LABOR AND PAYMENT OF DEBTS BY CONTRACTORS - Amends the definition of public works so that it would include any public works projects performed for any city or town or quasi-municipal entity and the state and any quasi-state entity.
Title
Amends the definition of public works so that it would include any public works projects performed for any city or town or quasi-municipal entity and the state and any quasi-state entity.
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7059.pdf |