RI H7089 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES - Requires that a business entity that is selling goods or services at retail offering a digital coupon to a consumer would also have to offer a paper coupon of identical value.
Title
Requires that a business entity that is selling goods or services at retail offering a digital coupon to a consumer would also have to offer a paper coupon of identical value.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2024) |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Commercial Law
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS
COMMERCIAL LAW -- GENERAL REGULATORY PROVISIONS -- UNFAIR SALES PRACTICES
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7089.pdf |