RI H7536 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Department Of Environmental Management - Pets (would Allow Domesticated Animals Or Birds Weighing Less Than Thirty-five Pounds (35 Lbs.) To Accompany Their Owners At State-owned Campgrounds.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Department Of Environmental Management - Pets (would Allow Domesticated Animals Or Birds Weighing Less Than Thirty-five Pounds (35 Lbs.) To Accompany Their Owners At State-owned Campgrounds.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-06-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2012-06-13 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | House passed Sub A as amended | |
2012-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-03-29 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7536.pdf |