RI H7581 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- CORRECTIONS STAFFING - Establishes parameters for staffing of correctional officers.
Title
Establishes parameters for staffing of correctional officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7581.pdf |