RI H7744 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION ACT - Provides that a defendant's third and subsequent violation of domestic violence offenses, including both prior felony and misdemeanor convictions, be punishable as a felony.
Title
Provides that a defendant's third and subsequent violation of domestic violence offenses, including both prior felony and misdemeanor convictions, be punishable as a felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - House - Passage (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-05-15 | House | House read and passed |
2024-05-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/15/2024) |
2024-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |