RI H7756 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- MAIL BALLOTS - Eliminates requirements of signing with an "X" for voters who cannot sign name due to blindness, disability, or inability to read or write. Establishes a timeframe for local boards to accept mail ballot applications, if delivered via the postal service.
Title
Eliminates requirements of signing with an "X" for voters who cannot sign name due to blindness, disability, or inability to read or write. Establishes a timeframe for local boards to accept mail ballot applications, if delivered via the postal service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-05-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-17 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |