RI H7797 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- VACCINATION, TESTING, AND MASK MANDATES PROHIBITION - Prohibits a private employer from mandating a COVID-19 vaccination upon any full-time, part-time, or contract employee without providing individual exemptions that allow an employee to opt out of such mandate.
Title
Prohibits a private employer from mandating a COVID-19 vaccination upon any full-time, part-time, or contract employee without providing individual exemptions that allow an employee to opt out of such mandate.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Brian Rea [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7797.pdf |