RI H7842 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurance companies to annually file the director of business regulation a corporate governance disclosure form which contains a summary of the carriers structure, policies and practices.
Title
Corporate Governances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2016-05-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/19/2016) |
2016-05-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |