RI H7902 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminals - Correctional Institutions - Parole (would Mandate That One Of The Members Of The Parole Board Be A Psychologist Or A Physician Who Is Professionally Qualified In The Field Of Psychiatry Or Neurology)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminals - Correctional Institutions - Parole (would Mandate That One Of The Members Of The Parole Board Be A Psychologist Or A Physician Who Is Professionally Qualified In The Field Of Psychiatry Or Neurology)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-07 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2012-06-05 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-05-16 | House read and passed | |
2012-05-08 | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2012) | |
2012-05-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2012) | |
2012-03-20 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7902.pdf |