RI H7906 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- CERTIFICATION OF TEACHERS - Extends teacher certifications without fee or penalty for three (3) or five (5) years for teachers who hold certifications as of July 1, 2024.
Title
Extends teacher certifications without fee or penalty for three (3) or five (5) years for teachers who hold certifications as of July 1, 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7906.pdf |