RI H7944 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the division of statewide planning to maintain an affordable housing online database website. Also directs Rhode Island housing to prepare biannual status snapshot reports related to affordable housing.
Title
Low And Moderate Income Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 12 N: 57 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 12 N: 57 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2022-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |