RI H8076 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Temporary Disability Insurance Benefits (allow Individuals Who Receive A Lump Sum Settlement From Workers’ Comp. To Subsequently Apply For Temporary Disability Benefits As Long As The Sickness/illness Is Different From The One For Which The Individual Was Paid Workers’ Comp.)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Temporary Disability Insurance Benefits (allow Individuals Who Receive A Lump Sum Settlement From Workers’ Comp. To Subsequently Apply For Temporary Disability Benefits As Long As The Sickness/illness Is Different From The One For Which The Individual Was Paid Workers’ Comp.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | House read and passed | |
2012-06-11 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-06-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2012) | |
2012-05-02 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2012) | |
2012-04-24 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8076.pdf |