RI S2039 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires RIDE to implement a plan ensuring that students enrolled in public schools become climate literate by graduation from high school.
Title
The Climate Literacy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |