RI S2047 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- REDEVELOPMENT PROJECTS - Adds the city of Central Falls as exempt from taxation for property acquired by an agency for redevelopment purposes.
Title
Adds the city of Central Falls as exempt from taxation for property acquired by an agency for redevelopment purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2024) |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |