RI S2049 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the general treasurer to withhold state aid to municipalities which do not fully fund their annual required contribution to a locally administered pension plan
Title
Retirement Security Act For Locally Administered Pension Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] |
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2014) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |