RI S2049 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the state earned-income credit as of January 1, 2021, to eighteen percent (18%) of the federal earned-income credit, not to exceed the amount of state income tax.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2049.pdf |