RI S2049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits PFAS, a class of fluorinated organic chemicals, from being used in food packaging and requires that any carpeting/clothing manufactured or sold in this state carry a warning label. Violations are punishable by fine of $1000 for each offense.
Title
Prohibition Of Pfas In Food Packaging, Clothing And Carpeting Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |