RI S2054 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PERSONAL INCOME TAX - Increases the state earned-income credit as of January 1, 2025 to seventeen percent (17%) of the federal earned-income credit, not to exceed the amount of state income tax.
Title
Increases the state earned-income credit as of January 1, 2025 to seventeen percent (17%) of the federal earned-income credit, not to exceed the amount of state income tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2054.pdf |