RI S2061 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PERSONAL INCOME TAX - Allows a modification to federal adjusted gross income for all social security income for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2025.
Title
Allows a modification to federal adjusted gross income for all social security income for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2025.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2061.pdf |