RI S2125 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates references to now deleted provisions and substitutes the revised statutory references and provide a mechanism to enforce the right to continuation of medical benefits.
Title
Payment Of Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |