RI S2125 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-13 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-13 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- PAYMENT OF WAGES - Provides employees with civil administrative remedies against contractors, subcontractors involved in the contract with joint/severable liability imposed on contractors or subcontractors. Effective 9/1/2024.
Title
Provides employees with civil administrative remedies against contractors, subcontractors involved in the contract with joint/severable liability imposed on contractors or subcontractors. Effective 9/1/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |