RI S2162 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits licensed barbers, hairdressers, cosmeticians, manicurists, and estheticians to relocate to another hair design shop once during the term of their license without needing to obtain another license.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists, And Estheticians
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-06 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/05/2016) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/28/2016) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |