RI S2274 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- VITAL RECORDS - Requires the division of vital records to ensure that the records are accessible to the local registrars and grant local registrars the authority to issue certified copies of certificates and records.
Title
Requires the division of vital records to ensure that the records are accessible to the local registrars and grant local registrars the authority to issue certified copies of certificates and records.
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Indefinite postponement (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Indefinite postponement (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2024-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-17 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2024-05-10 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |