RI S2497 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Fiduciaries -- Powers Of Fiduciaries
Title
An Act Relating To Fiduciaries -- Powers Of Fiduciaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-23 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-06-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-04-03 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-03-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2497.pdf |