RI S2537 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AGRICULTURE AND FORESTRY -- ORGANIC FARMING AND CERTIFICATION PROGRAM - Establishes the organic farming and certification program to be administered by the department of environmental management.
Title
Establishes the organic farming and certification program to be administered by the department of environmental management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2537.pdf |