RI S2551 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- RHODE ISLAND PROMISE SCHOLARSHIP -- RHODE ISLAND HOPE SCHOLARSHIP PILOT PROGRAM - Extends the time for which a student may enroll in order to qualify for the Promise Scholarship or the Hope Scholarship up to one year after high school graduation.
Title
Extends the time for which a student may enroll in order to qualify for the Promise Scholarship or the Hope Scholarship up to one year after high school graduation.
Sponsors
Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION -- RHODE ISLAND PROMISE SCHOLARSHIP
EDUCATION -- RHODE ISLAND PROMISE SCHOLARSHIP -- RHODE ISLAND HOPE SCHOLARSHIP PILOT PROGRAM
EDUCATION -- RHODE ISLAND PROMISE SCHOLARSHIP
EDUCATION -- RHODE ISLAND PROMISE SCHOLARSHIP -- RHODE ISLAND HOPE SCHOLARSHIP PILOT PROGRAM
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2551.pdf |