RI S2557 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- BEHAVIORAL HEALTH EDUCATION, TRAINING, AND COORDINATION FUND - Establishes the behavioral health education, training, and coordination fund to receive the checkoff contributions from Rhode Island personal income tax returns for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2024.
Title
Establishes the behavioral health education, training, and coordination fund to receive the checkoff contributions from Rhode Island personal income tax returns for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2024.
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-05 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee continued |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |