RI S2649 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the statute of limitations for unlawful appropriation from three (3) years to ten (10) years.
Title
Indictments, Informations, And Complaints
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |