RI S2692 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits insurance companies from varying the premium rates charged for a health coverage plan based on the gender.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate passed as amended |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/14/2016) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |