RI S2720 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows police officers to seize weapons without warrant, from individuals they determine pose a risk of serious harm to themselves or others and establishes procedures for review of seizure in the Superior Court.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2720.pdf |