RI S2720 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-29 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-29 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- PRESCRIPTION DRUG BENEFITS - Includes any costs paid by an enrollee or on behalf of the enrollee by a third party when calculating an enrollee's overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or cost sharing requirement under a health plan as of January 1, 2025.
Title
Includes any costs paid by an enrollee or on behalf of the enrollee by a third party when calculating an enrollee's overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or cost sharing requirement under a health plan as of January 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |