RI S2766 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-31 - Referred to House State Government & Elections
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-31 - Referred to House State Government & Elections
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC RECORDS -- PUBLIC RECORDS ADMINISTRATION - Updates public records administration act, modifies records control schedule, designates records officer, establishes procedures for retention of records. Provides administrator submit yearly reports, establishes public reporting compliance.
Title
Updates public records administration act, modifies records control schedule, designates records officer, establishes procedures for retention of records. Provides administrator submit yearly reports, establishes public reporting compliance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |