RI S2775 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DELINQUENT AND DEPENDENT CHILDREN -- PROCEEDINGS IN FAMILY COURT - Prohibit the family court from detaining any juvenile or committing any juvenile, under the age of 14 years, to the training school, for any offense other than murder, first degree sexual assault, or an attempt to commit such offenses.
Title
Prohibit the family court from detaining any juvenile or committing any juvenile, under the age of 14 years, to the training school, for any offense other than murder, first degree sexual assault, or an attempt to commit such offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2775.pdf |