RI S2818 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- LICENSING OF HEALTHCARE FACILITIES - Requires the disclosure of the transfer of certain assets of healthcare facilities and would provide penalties for failing to file healthcare facility ownership information.
Title
Requires the disclosure of the transfer of certain assets of healthcare facilities and would provide penalties for failing to file healthcare facility ownership information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2024) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |